ND SB2004 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state department of health; to amend and reenact sections 23-01-02, 54-27-25, 61-02.1-02.1, and 61-02.1-04 of the North Dakota Century Code and section 510 of House Bill No. 1247, as approved by the sixty-seventh legislative assembly, relating to compensation of members of the health council, the tobacco settlement trust fund, statewide water development project funding, bonds payable, and the transfer of appropriation authority to the department of health and human services; to repeal sections 54-27-25.1 and 61-02.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to water development trust fund expenditures and the water development trust fund; to provide for a transfer; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a report; to provide for a legislative management study; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Water development trust fund expenditures and the water development trust fund; to provide for a transfer; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a report; to provide for a legislative management study; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/07 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-29 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 76 nays 12 |
2021-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-28 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 6, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Conference committee appointed Kreidt Strinden Mitskog |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Sorvaag Bekkedahl Mathern |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 53 nays 39 |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 2 2 |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |