ND SB2004 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state auditor; to amend and reenact sections 54-10-01 and 54-10-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the powers and duties of the state auditor and the salary of the state auditor; to provide for a report; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The powers and duties of the state auditor and the salary of the state auditor; to provide for a report; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/02 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-25 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-25 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 72 nays 20 |
2019-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Brandenburg Howe Mock |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Oehlke Dever Grabinger |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-04 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 1 |
2019-04-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 0 3 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |