ND SB2004 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state auditor; to provide an appropriation to the legislative council; and to amend and reenact section 54-10-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the state auditor.
Title
The salary of the state auditor.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/10 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/09 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-27 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-26 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Conference committee appointed Dahl Thoreson Glassheim | |
2011-04-05 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-04 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-04-04 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3 | |
2011-03-31 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-22 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-21 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-01-12 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |