ND 2003 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2, Emergency clause carried
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota university system; to create and enact two new sections to chapter 15-10 and a new section to chapter 54-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to approval of capital projects requested by institutions under the control of the state board of higher education, the nickel trophy, and tuition and fee waivers for law enforcement officers; and to amend and reenact sections 15-10-48, 15-10-49, 15-18.2-05, 15-18.2-06, 54-10-22.1, and 54-44.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to matching grants for institutions under the control of the state board of higher education, state aid to institutions, the minimum amount payable through the higher education funding formula, protecting donor records from audits of university and college foundations, and the cancellation of unexpended appropriations; to repeal chapter 15-10.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the midwestern higher education compact; to provide for the transfer of funds; to authorize the state board of higher education to issue and sell bonds for capital projects; to provide exemptions; to provide for the reallocation of oil and gas tax distributions; to authorize the conveyance of real property owned by the state of North Dakota; to provide for studies; to provide for legislative management reports; to provide legislative intent; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The midwestern higher education compact; to provide for the transfer of funds; to authorize the state board of higher education to issue and sell bonds for capital projects; to provide exemptions; to provide for the reallocation of oil and gas tax distributions; to authorize the conveyance of real property owned by the state of North Dakota; to provide for studies; to provide for legislative management reports; to provide legislative intent; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-26SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-26SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-17HouseConference committee appointed Sanford Martinson Streyle
2017-04-17SenateConference committee appointed Holmberg Krebsbach Robinson
2017-04-17SenateRefused to concur
2017-04-17SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-14HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-04-14HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 77 nays 10
2017-04-14HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-14HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 1 1
2017-03-22HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-03-16HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 02:15
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 01:30
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 10:45
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 03:45
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 02:15
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 01:30
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-22HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-21SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-20SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 02:15
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 01:30
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 10:45
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 03:45
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 02:15
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 01:30
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback