ND 2002 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the judicial branch; to provide a transfer; and to provide for a legislative management study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the judicial branch; to provide a transfer; and to provide for a legislative management study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13SenateSigned by Governor 04/13
2017-04-10SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-10SenateSigned by President
2017-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-07SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-04-07SenateConcurred
2017-04-05SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 7
2017-04-04HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-04HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 2 3
2017-03-15HouseCommittee Hearing 04:00
2017-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-02-17SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-16SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-02-14SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-01-05SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback