ND SB2002 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of the secretary of state and public printing; to provide exemptions; to amend and reenact section 54-09-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the secretary of state; to provide for legislative management studies; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The salary of the secretary of state; to provide for legislative management studies; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/23 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-21 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-21 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 80 nays 11 |
2015-04-21 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Conference committee appointed Monson Dosch Boe |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Carlisle Sorvaag Robinson |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-10 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-10 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 65 nays 24 |
2015-04-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 9 1 |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |