ND SB2001 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the legislative branch of state government; to amend and reenact sections 54-03-20 and 54-35-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to legislative compensation; to provide for a report; to provide for application, transfer, and cancellation of unexpended appropriations; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Legislative compensation; to provide for a report; to provide for application, transfer, and cancellation of unexpended appropriations; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-05 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-05 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 71 nays 22 |
2021-04-01 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 2 1 |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |