ND 2001 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by Governor, but item veto 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the legislative branch of state government; to provide for applications, transfers, and cancellation of unexpended appropriations; to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-35 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of a legislative revenue advisory committee; to provide for legislative management studies; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The creation of a legislative revenue advisory committee; to provide for legislative management studies; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateSigned by Governor, but item veto 05/01
2017-04-27SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-26SenateSigned by President
2017-04-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-26HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-04-26HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 7
2017-04-26HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-25HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-25SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-25SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-07HouseConference committee appointed Vigesaa Boehning Delmore
2017-04-06SenateConference committee appointed Holmberg Wanzek Robinson
2017-04-06SenateRefused to concur
2017-04-05SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-05HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 84 nays 6
2017-04-04HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-04HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 0 3
2017-03-16HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-21HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-20SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-20SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback