ND HB1546 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 14-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibition on human dismemberment abortion; to amend and reenact section 2 of chapter 132 of the 2007 Session Laws, relating to the implementation of the prohibition of the performance of abortions; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The implementation of the prohibition of the performance of abortions; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 12 |
2019-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 39 nays 7 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-31 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 13 |
2019-01-29 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 2 3 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |