ND HB1544 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to electronic operator's licenses; and to amend and reenact section 39-06-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the renewal of operator's licenses.
Title
The renewal of operator's licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Sebastian Ertelt [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 23 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 67 |
2019-02-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |