ND HB1542 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create a task force for the purpose of studying the needs and challenges of North Dakota's autonomous ecosystem; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create a task force for the purpose of studying the needs and challenges of North Dakota's autonomous ecosystem; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] | Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] |
Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 23 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70 |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |