ND 1533 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 50-06-22, 53-06.1-08.2, and 53-06.1-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to deposits in the gambling disorder prevention and treatment fund, electronic pull tab device requirements and limitations, and the charitable gaming tax; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide an expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deposits in the gambling disorder prevention and treatment fund, electronic pull tab device requirements and limitations, and the charitable gaming tax; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide an expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
2019-04-24SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-24SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 58 nays 31
2019-04-23HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-23HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-05SenateConference committee appointed Cook Kannianen Dotzenrod
2019-04-03HouseConference committee appointed Headland Dockter Mitskog
2019-04-03HouseRefused to concur
2019-03-26HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 38 nays 7
2019-03-25SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-22SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-11SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2019-02-20SenateReceived from House
2019-02-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on table
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 27
2019-02-18HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 5 3
2019-02-07HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-07HouseAmendment adopted
2019-02-06HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback