ND HB1532 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 53-06.1-08 and 53-06.1-08.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to pull tabs and electronic pull tab devices.
Title
Pull tabs and electronic pull tab devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] |
Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 39 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 1 1 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 67 nays 25 |
2019-02-14 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-02-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0 |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |