ND 1531 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-18-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to allowing individuals who do not have a teaching license to teach noncore subjects upon meeting certain criteria; to provide for a legislative management report; and to provide an expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing individuals who do not have a teaching license to teach noncore subjects upon meeting certain criteria; to provide for a legislative management report; and to provide an expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseSigned by Governor 04/25
2019-04-23HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-23SenateSigned by President
2019-04-19SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 34 nays 13
2019-04-19SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-18SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 10
2019-04-18HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-18HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-17SenateAppoint Sen. Davison to replace Sen. Schaible on conference committee
2019-04-10SenateConference committee appointed Rust Schaible Oban
2019-04-08HouseConference committee appointed Owens Zubke Guggisberg
2019-04-08HouseRefused to concur
2019-04-01HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 28 nays 19
2019-04-01SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-29SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0
2019-03-12SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2019-02-18SenateReceived from House
2019-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 7
2019-02-14HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-13HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-29HouseCommittee Hearing 08:45
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba1531.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1055-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1055-01002a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1055-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1055-02003a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1055-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1055-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1055-05000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-30.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-57.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-70.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-71.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback