ND 1524 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of privacy practices in the data broker industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of privacy practices in the data broker industry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 44
2019-03-19SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-02-27SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-12SenateReceived from House
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2019-02-06HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback