ND 1514 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State

Summary

Introduced by Sen. Hogue, Warner A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 24-02-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to use of the special road fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Introduced by Sen. Hogue, Warner A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 24-02-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to use of the special road fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-22 Filed with Secretary of State
2009-04-21 Signed by Governor
2009-04-20 Sent to Governor
2009-04-20 Signed by Speaker
2009-04-16 Signed by President
2009-04-14 Second reading, passed, yeas 076 nays 015
2009-04-14 Concurred
2009-04-01 Returned to House (12)
2009-04-01 Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000
2009-03-24 Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
2009-03-23 Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000
2009-03-19 Committee Hearing 09:00
2009-02-26 Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation
2009-02-25 Received from House
2009-02-18 Second reading, passed, yeas 082 nays 011
2009-02-16 Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
2009-02-13 Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000
2009-02-12 Committee Hearing 10:30
2009-01-19 Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback