ND HB1513 | 2021 | 67th Legislative Assembly Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Signed by Governor 11/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Signed by Governor 11/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact subsection 5 of section 16.1-03-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to district party organization; to amend and reenact section 16.1-03-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to political party reorganization after redistricting; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Political party reorganization after redistricting; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-12 | House | Signed by Governor 11/11 |
2021-11-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-11-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-11-10 | House | Returned to House |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Engrossment placed on calendar 15 1 0 |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Introduced, first reading |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-11-09 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 6 |
2021-11-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-11-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 1 0 |
2021-11-09 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-11-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Joint Redistricting Committee |