ND 1513 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 3 of section 54-35-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the review of economic development tax incentives; and to amend and reenact subdivision b of subsection 2 of section 54-60.1-01 and subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to business incentives and individual income tax credits that may be claimed by a taxpayer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business incentives and individual income tax credits that may be claimed by a taxpayer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 3 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 43
2019-04-22SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-19SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede)
2019-04-19HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-18HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede)
2019-04-17HouseConference committee report rejected
2019-04-16HouseReported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-03SenateConference committee appointed Unruh Meyer Dotzenrod
2019-04-01HouseConference committee appointed Grueneich Blum Eidson
2019-04-01HouseRefused to concur
2019-03-27HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-26SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2019-03-26SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-25SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2019-02-12SenateReceived from House
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 6
2019-02-06HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-29HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback