ND 1511 | 2021 | 67th Legislative Assembly Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Signed by Governor 11/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 34-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to employer-required COVID-19 vaccinations; to amend and reenact sections 23-01-05.3 and 23-12-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to vaccine passports and limitations on requiring documentation of COVID-19 vaccinations, antibodies, and post-transmission recovery status; to repeal section 23-12-20 of the North Dakota Century Code and section 2 of this Act, relating to limitations on requiring documentation of COVID-19 vaccinations, antibodies, and post-transmission recovery status and employer-required COVID-19 vaccinations; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitations on requiring documentation of COVID-19 vaccinations, antibodies, and post-transmission recovery status and employer-required COVID-19 vaccinations; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-11-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-11-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-12HouseSigned by Governor 11/12
2021-11-12HouseSent to Governor
2021-11-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-11-12SenateSigned by President
2021-11-12HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 11
2021-11-12HouseConcurred
2021-11-12HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-11-12SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 33 nays 14
2021-11-12SenateAmendment failed
2021-11-12SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2021-11-12SenateAmendment adopted
2021-11-12SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2021-11-12SenateEngrossment placed on calendar 11 5 0
2021-11-11SenateIntroduced, first reading
2021-11-11SenateReceived from House
2021-11-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 11
2021-11-11HouseDivision B passed
2021-11-11HouseDivision A passed
2021-11-11HouseDivision of bill
2021-11-11HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-11-11HouseDivision D adopted
2021-11-11HouseDivision C adopted
2021-11-11HouseDivision B adopted
2021-11-11HouseDivision A adopted
2021-11-11HouseDivision of amendment
2021-11-11HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 5 0
2021-11-09SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-11-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Joint Technical Corrections Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback