ND HB1508 | 2021 | 67th Legislative Assembly Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Signed by Governor 11/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Signed by Governor 11/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting the teaching of critical race theory in public schools; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Prohibiting the teaching of critical race theory in public schools; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-12 | House | Signed by Governor 11/12 |
2021-11-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-11-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-11-12 | House | Returned to House |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 9 |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Engrossment placed on calendar 12 4 0 |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-11-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 16 |
2021-11-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-11-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 4 0 |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-11-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Joint Technical Corrections Committee |