ND 1507 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 54-12-33.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to human trafficking prevention training; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human trafficking prevention training; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseSigned by Governor 04/04
2019-04-01HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-29SenateSigned by President
2019-03-28HouseReturned to House
2019-03-27SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-03-25SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0
2019-03-25SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2019-02-18SenateReceived from House
2019-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 4
2019-02-14HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-13HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
2019-01-29HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback