ND HB1502 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 39-04-37, a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 39-06.1-06, and a new paragraph to subdivision a of subsection 3 of section 39-06.1-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the amount of statutory fees, entries against driving record, and moving violations; to amend and reenact section 39-04-55, subsections 2 and 4 of section 39-05-17, section 39-06-16, subdivision f of subsection 2 of section 39-06.1-06, subsection 1 of section 39-06.1-08, section 39-06.1-09, subdivision b of subsection 3 of section 39-06.1-10, subsection 2 of section 39-10-26, subsections 1 and 2 of section 39-10-38, and section 39-21-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the amount of statutory fees and moving violations and entries against driving record; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The amount of statutory fees and moving violations and entries against driving record; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Sen. David Clemens [R] |
Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2021-04-13 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Conference committee appointed D. Larsen Clemens Bakke |
2021-04-05 | House | Appoint Rep. Paur to replace Rep. Becker on conference committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Conference committee appointed Becker Paulson Hager |
2021-04-01 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-03-25 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2021-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |