ND HB1501 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 57-36.2 and a new subsection to section 57-39.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to imposition of a gross receipts tax and an excise tax on usable marijuana and adult-use cannabis products; to provide a penalty; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Title
Imposition of a gross receipts tax and an excise tax on usable marijuana and adult-use cannabis products; to provide a penalty; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] |
Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 21 |
2021-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |