ND HB1500 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 15-10.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a new state higher education governance structure; members, terms, duties, and authority for new entities comprising the new state higher education governance structure; and transferring duties of the state board of higher education, the commissioner of higher education, the North Dakota university system, and the North Dakota university system office to new entities comprising the new state higher education governance structure; to amend and reenact sections 1-01-49 and 11-38-12, subdivisions s and w of subsection 2 of section 12-60-24, sections 15-10.1-01.1, 15-10.1-02, 15-10.1-03, 15-10.1-04, 15-10.1-05, 15-10.3-02, 15-10.3-03, 15-10.3-04, 15-11-15, 15-11-22, and 15-11-30, subsection 2 of section 15-11-35, sections 15-12-10, 15-12.1-01, 15-12.1-02, and 15-12.1-04, subsection 4 of section 15-12.1-14, sections 15-12.1-17, 15-17-03, 15-17-05, 15-18-06, 15-18.1-01, 15-18.1-02, 15-18.1-03, 15-18.1-04, 15-18.1-05, 15-18.1-06, 15-18.1-07, 15-18.1-10, and 15-18.1-12, subsection 4 of section 15-18.1-13, section 15-18.1-15, subsection 2 of section 15-18.1-16, sections 15-18.2-01, 15-18.2-02, and 15-18.2-03, subsection 1 of section 15-18.2-04, sections 15-18.2-05 and 15-20.1-02, subdivision d of subsection 12 of section 15-39.1-04, sections 15-39.1-25, 15-39.2-01, 15-39.2-01.1, 15-39.2-04.1, 15-39.2-05, and 15-52-02, subdivision b of subsection 2 of section 15-52-03, sections 15-52-05 and 15-52-10, subsection 1 of section 15-52-16, sections 15-52-25, 15-52-26, 15-52-28, 15-52-29, 15-52-30, 15-52-31, 15-55-01, 15-55-02, 15-55-03, 15-55-04.1, 15-55-05.1, 15-55-06, 15-55-07, 15-55-09, 15-55-10, 15-55-14, 15-55-20, 15-62.4-01, 15-62.4-02, 15-62.4-03, 15-62.4-05, 15-62.5-01, 15-62.5-02, 15-62.5-03, 15-62.5-04, 15-63-01, 15-69-01, 15-69-03, 15-70-03, 15-70-04, 15-71-01, 15-71-02, 15-71-03, 15.1-01-02, and 15.1-07-25.1, subsection 1 of section 15.1-15-12, sections 15.1-21-02.6 and 15.1-21-02.8, subdivision f of subsection 1 of section 15.1-37-02, sections 18-12-03, 18-12-04, and 18-12-23, subdivision e of subsection 12 of section 20.1-02-05, subsection 7 of section 26.1-05-19, section 26.1-22-09, subdivision j of subsection 2 of section 28-32-01, section 29-29.5-03, subsection 5 of section 34-11.1-04, sections 37-07.2-01 and 44-04-18.4, subsection 1 of section 44-04-18.15, sections 44-04-18.16 and 44-04-18.28, subsection 7 of section 44-04-20, subsection 2 of section 44-08-05.1, section 48-01.2-02, subsection 7 of section 51-35-01, subdivision c of subsection 13 of section 52-02.1-01, sections 52-08-08, 52-08-09, 52-08-10, 52-08-11, 54-10-22.1, 54-10-30, and 54-12-08, subsections 1 and 5 of section 54-12-35, sections 54-27-10, 54-27-11, 54-27-12, and 54-27-27, subsection 1 of section 54-27-27.1, sections 54-27-27.2, 54-35-15.2, and 54-44.1-04, subsection 4 of section 54-44.1-06, subsection 8 of section 54-44.3-20, section 54-44.4-11, subsections 1 and 2 of section 54-44.4-13, subsection 1 of section 54-46-02, subsection 3 of section 54-52.6-01, subsection 1 of section 54-57-03, sections 54-59-02.1, 54-59-05, 54-59-07, and 54-59-11.1, section 54-59-12, subdivision c of subsection 2 of section 54-59-17, section 54-59-22, subdivision e of subsection 1 of section 54-59-22.1, subsection 1 of section 54-59-23, subsection 1 of section 54-59-32, subdivision f of subsection 4 of section 54-59-34, section 54-60-06, subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 54-60-19, section 54-60-26, subdivision h of subsection 1 of section 54-63-03, subsection 6 of section 54-65-01, subsection 6 of section 54-65-02, and section 65-05.1-06.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a new state higher education governance structure; members, terms, duties, and authority for new entities comprising the new state higher education governance structure; and transferring duties of the state board of higher education, the commissioner of higher education, the North Dakota university system, and the North Dakota university system office to new entities comprising the new state higher education governance structure; to repeal chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state board of higher education; to provide a penalty; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Title
The state board of higher education; to provide a penalty; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Jake Blum [R] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] |
Rep. Mary Johnson [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Denton Zubke [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] |
Sen. Jim Roers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 19 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 74 |
2019-02-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |