ND HB1499 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to election requirements for bonds.
Title
Election requirements for bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 9 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 84 |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2021-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |