ND HB1499 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-35-02.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the duties of the employee benefits programs committee.
Title
The duties of the employee benefits programs committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] |
Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 10 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 80 |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |