ND 1498 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 62.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to brandishing a dangerous weapon; and to amend and reenact sections 12.1-05-06, 12.1-05-07, and 12.1-05-07.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to use of force in defense of property, limits on the use of force and deadly force, and immunity from civil liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of force in defense of property, limits on the use of force and deadly force, and immunity from civil liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Governor 04/19
2021-04-15HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-14SenateSigned by President
2021-04-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 10
2021-04-09HouseConcurred
2021-04-08HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-08SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 35 nays 10
2021-04-08SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
2021-04-06SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 16
2021-02-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 1 3
2021-02-15HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback