ND 1497 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 57-38-01.21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit for charitable contributions to a qualified endowment or a qualified nonprofit organization; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An income tax credit for charitable contributions to a qualified endowment or a qualified nonprofit organization; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 27 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 67
2021-02-03HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 4 2
2021-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback