ND HB1497 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 12.1-05-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limits on the use of force and deadly force.
Title
Limits on the use of force and deadly force.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Rep. Sebastian Ertelt [R] | Rep. Jeff Hoverson [R] | Rep. Daniel Johnston [R] |
Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Sen. Bob Paulson [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 41 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 49 |
2019-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 08:50 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |