ND 1496 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 16.1-08.1-02.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to statewide political parties' campaign finance disclosures; to amend and reenact subsection 8 of section 16.1-08.1-01 and sections 16.1-08.1-02.3 and 16.1-08.1-02.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reporting of expenditures for political purposes; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reporting of expenditures for political purposes; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
2021-04-01SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-25SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 7
2021-02-23HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-02-05HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback