ND 1494 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of law enforcement and correctional officer recruitment, retention, turnover, and training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of law enforcement and correctional officer recruitment, retention, turnover, and training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05HouseSigned by Governor 04/01
2021-03-31HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-31HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-29SenateSigned by President
2021-03-26HouseReturned to House
2021-03-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2
2021-03-24SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2021-02-10SenateReceived from House
2021-02-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 12
2021-02-03HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-02HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
2021-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback