ND HB1491 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 54-10-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment by the state auditor of a federal program and governmental entity review division.
Title
The establishment by the state auditor of a federal program and governmental entity review division.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Jake Blum [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. William Devlin [R] |
Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Austen Schauer [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
Rep. Steve Vetter [R] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 33 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 58 |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 17 2 2 |
2019-01-28 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported back, do pass 12 2 0 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |