ND 1488 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 14-02.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of the truth, healing, and reconciliation commission; to provide for a legislative management report; and to provide an expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The creation of the truth, healing, and reconciliation commission; to provide for a legislative management report; and to provide an expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 20 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 72
2021-02-09HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-02-08HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback