ND 1487 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 4.1-03-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the beef checkoff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The beef checkoff.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 41 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 53
2021-02-08HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1
2021-02-05HouseCommittee Hearing 01:45
2021-02-05HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-21HouseRereferred to Agriculture
2021-01-21HouseRequest return from committee
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback