ND HB1486 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 005 nays 087
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 005 nays 087
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Stenehjem, O'Connell (At the request of the Governor) A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-27.2-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the budget stabilization fund.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Stenehjem, O'Connell (At the request of the Governor) A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-27.2-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the budget stabilization fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-18 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 005 nays 087 | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 020 n 005 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1486.html |