ND HB1485 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 6-09.4-24 and 21-03-06.1, subsection 1 of section 48-12-01, and section 54-44.5-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to building authorities; and to repeal chapter 54-17.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the North Dakota building authority.
Title
The North Dakota building authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 9 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 85 |
2021-02-05 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |