ND HB1484 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 21-03-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county bonding authority.
Title
County bonding authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 6 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 87 |
2021-02-05 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |