ND HB1484 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-51.1 and chapter 65-05.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a health and human services stabilization fund and a paid family medical leave program; to amend and reenact sections 15-10-48 and 15-10-49 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to matching grants for institutions under the control of the state board of higher education; to provide an appropriation; to provide for transfers; to provide statements of legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Matching grants for institutions under the control of the state board of higher education; to provide an appropriation; to provide for transfers; to provide statements of legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Tracy Boe [D] | Rep. Richard Holman [D] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Sen. John Grabinger [D] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 15 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 78 |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee |