ND HB1483 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 11-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to lease purchase.
Title
Lease purchase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2021-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 11 |
2021-04-13 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 8 |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |