ND 1482 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-04-10.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to antique motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Antique motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 12 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 79
2021-02-01HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-29HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0
2021-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback