ND 1478 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to alternative education opportunities outside the classroom for course credit; and to provide for a legislative management report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative education opportunities outside the classroom for course credit; and to provide for a legislative management report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Governor 04/19
2021-04-16HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-15SenateSigned by President
2021-04-13HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 5
2021-04-13HouseConcurred
2021-03-23HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-22SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-19SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-18SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-09SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2021-02-19SenateReceived from House
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 7
2021-02-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2021-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback