ND HB1478 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 27-20-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to juvenile hearings.
Title
Juvenile hearings.
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Karla Hanson [D] | Rep. Mary Johnson [R] |
Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Sen. Jonell Bakke [D] | Sen. David Hogue [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2019-03-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |