ND 1471 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 9 of section 57-02-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a property tax exemption for property of churches; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A property tax exemption for property of churches; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Governor 04/19
2021-04-16HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-15SenateSigned by President
2021-04-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 15
2021-04-14HouseConcurred
2021-04-05HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1
2021-04-01SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-31SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-23SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-02-10SenateReceived from House
2021-02-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 18
2021-02-04HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-03HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
2021-02-01HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback