ND 1471 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 40-47 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to extraterritorial zoning fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extraterritorial zoning fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseSigned by Governor 04/10
2019-04-05HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President
2019-04-02HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2019-04-02HouseConcurred
2019-03-20HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-19SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 36 nays 10
2019-03-18SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-15SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2019-03-01SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-01-31SenateReceived from House
2019-01-30HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1
2019-01-25HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0
2019-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback