ND 1471 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 020 nays 073

Summary

Introduced by Sen. Potter A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the election of school board members; to amend and reenact sections 16.1-11-08 and 16.1-11-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to references to party affiliation in elections for elective county and city offices; and to repeal section 40-21-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to references to party affiliation in petitions of candidates for city elective offices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Introduced by Sen. Potter A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the election of school board members; to amend and reenact sections 16.1-11-08 and 16.1-11-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to references to party affiliation in elections for elective county and city offices; and to repeal section 40-21-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to references to party affiliation in petitions of candidates for city elective offices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-03 Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 020 nays 073
2009-01-28 Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 009 n 003
2009-01-26 Committee Hearing 08:00
2009-01-19 Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback