ND 1470 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study relating to the behavioral health needs of inmates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study relating to the behavioral health needs of inmates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19HouseSigned by Governor 04/16
2021-04-14HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-06SenateSigned by President
2021-04-05HouseReturned to House
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4
2021-03-31SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2021-03-29SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-23SenateReceived from House
2021-02-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 7
2021-02-19HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-18HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback