ND HB1466 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact three new sections to chapter 50-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to establishing four-year old program grants; to amend and reenact section 50-11.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of four-year old program; to suspend sections 15.1-37-05, 15.1-37-06, and 15.1-37-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to early childhood education grants; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Early childhood education grants; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Greg Westlind [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] |
Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2021-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned to House |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 36 nays 11 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 5 1 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 59 nays 35 |
2021-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 7 2 |
2021-02-09 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported back, do pass 9 5 0 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |