ND 1465 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 23-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to vaccine information; to amend and reenact section 26.1-36-09.15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to coverage of telehealth services; to provide for a legislative management study; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coverage of telehealth services; to provide for a legislative management study; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseSigned by Governor 05/07
2021-04-29HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-29SenateSigned by President
2021-04-28SenateEmergency clause carried
2021-04-28SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3
2021-04-28SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-28SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-28HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 14, Emergency clause carried
2021-04-28HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-27HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-26HouseAppoint Rep. Weisz to replace Rep. Devlin on conference committee
2021-04-26HouseNew conference committee appointed Westlind Beltz Devlin
2021-04-23SenateConference committee report rejected
2021-04-22SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2
2021-04-22HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-22HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-19SenateConference committee appointed Anderson Lee Hogan
2021-04-19HouseConference committee appointed Westlind Beltz Devlin
2021-04-19HouseRefused to concur
2021-04-08HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-08SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 29 nays 17
2021-04-08SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2021-03-09SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2021-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-22SenateReceived from House
2021-02-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 70 nays 22
2021-02-18HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-17HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2021-02-03HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba1465.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0988-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0988-01001a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0988-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0988-02003a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0988-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0988-02008a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0988-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0988-02012a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0988-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0988-08000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-32.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-61.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-71.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-75.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-75.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback