ND HB1462 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 20.1-05.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to special allocation hunting licenses.
Title
Special allocation hunting licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Strinden [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Lauriebeth Hager [D] | Rep. Andrew Marschall [R] |
Rep. Austen Schauer [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | Concurred |
2019-03-21 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |