ND 1460 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision b of subsection 2 of section 15-10-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the powers and duties of the state board of higher education and law enforcement officer jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The powers and duties of the state board of higher education and law enforcement officer jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 93
2021-01-28HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback